Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against New York State Department Of Taxationand Finanace, Robert Skellie Aka Robert E Skellie Any Unknown Heirs Devisees Distributees Or Successors In Interest If Living And If Any Be Dead Any And All Persons Who Are Spouses Widows Grantees Mortgagees Lienors Heirs Devisees Distributees Executors Administrators Etl, United States Of America By The Internal Revenue Service, represented by Lesperance, Karen Folster, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 08, 2017APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: November 08, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Filed by KQC - 104021 |
||
June 12, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
June 12, 2023 | Affidavit of Posting | ||
June 12, 2023 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
June 12, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
June 12, 2023 | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | ||
June 12, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 05, 2023 | Notice of Sale filed by tmw 104021 | ||
April 05, 2023 |
PROOF OF SERVICE Certificate of Service of Notice of Sale |
||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY 104021-1 JFS NOE/cert of service. azh |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.