Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marc Berger, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Braymer, Claudia Knudsen, against Kimberley A. Nelson, Michael C. Nelson, Town Of Danby Planning Board, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE K.N. |
||
April 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE M.N. |
||
April 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Planning Board |
||
March 19, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
March 19, 2021 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
March 19, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 18, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
March 18, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Soils data |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.