Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Laura Scutt, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 08, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Invoice for Service |
||
July 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
July 12, 2021 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
July 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
July 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE |
||
July 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
July 08, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.