Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nathan Lamoreaux, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lissauer, Lawrence D., against County Of Tompkins, Town Of Dryden, represented by O'Neill, Kevin M., Walsh, Peter Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Elizabeth Aherne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElizabeth Aherne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law Case) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter scheduling jury trial |
||
December 16, 2022 | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | ||
December 06, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
November 30, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Amended Conference Stip/Order Proposed |
||
October 07, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Report of Neutral - Not Settled |
||
October 06, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference scheduled for 11/30/22 at 1:00 p.m. via Teams |
||
October 06, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Amended Stipulation (for use in preparation for 11/30/22 conference) |
||
October 03, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 23, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 09, 2022 |
ORDER - MEDIATION Order referring matter to Casey Egan Doyle, Esq. for mediation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.