Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Leigh Marshall, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reverby, Lawrence Arthur, against Daria Schneider, Spencer Lund, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 10, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) | ||
September 10, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 10, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 30, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Affirmation Exhibit 8: photos of subject premises |
||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Affirmation Exhibit 1: Notice of Pendency |
||
August 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Exhibit 5: Lease agreement |
||
August 26, 2021 | NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.