Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Nasa Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Murphy, Dennis D, against William Esty, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Agreement |
||
February 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
February 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit |
||
February 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Statement |
||
February 08, 2022 | Affirmation of Non-Exp of Statute of Limitations | ||
January 24, 2022 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST denied |
||
December 08, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COVER LETTER AND DMV SEARCH INCLUDED WITH ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
March 22, 2021 |
DEFECT CHECKLIST Denied-this is a credit card not a contract/please follow the NYS Consumer Credit Reform rules |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.