Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kathleen E Hall, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Kirby, Susan Craigie, against Theodore W Hall, represented by Lama, Luciano L., in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
July 28, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 26, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 26, 2021 | PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
April 16, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 02, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 25, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
January 22, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
January 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.