Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Guthrie Medical Group Pc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hammond, Chad Richard, against Rebecca Richart, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021EXECUTION
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
July 26, 2022 |
EXECUTION INCOME EXECUTION |
||
May 10, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
May 10, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AND ENTRY THEREOF |
||
May 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 07, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 07, 2021 |
BILL OF COSTS ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted per 22 NYCRR ITEMIZED INTEREST Redacted |
||
March 19, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING | ||
March 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 19, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPT OF DEFENSE REPORT Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.