Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against James A Palmer Est, Nys People, United States America Irs, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Craig J Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: March 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 20, 2021 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 09, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 08, 2021 |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20) Notice of Conversion to Electronic Filing |
||
May 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #5) Filed Summons and Complaint |
||
May 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #5) Attorney Affirmation |
||
May 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #5) AOS and back page |
||
May 14, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #5) *Corrected* Order |
||
May 14, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #5) Filed Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.