Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Lisa A Briggs, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Patrick F Mcallister presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick F Mcallister Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 05, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT, NOT OF DEF LTR and STIPULATION |
||
February 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT AND NON MILITARY |
||
February 01, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) order with notice of entry |
||
February 01, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) *Corrected* Judgment |
||
January 26, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) affidavit of service and blueback |
||
December 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) SETTLEMENT STIPULATION |
||
December 03, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) NOTICE OF MOTION PAGE |
||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) AFFIRMATION PAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.