Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against William T Bilancio, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Jason L. Cook presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason L. Cook Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Notice of Court Date |
||
March 17, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
March 03, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 22, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) RJI, CONSUMER CREDIT (CARD) ORIGINAL CREDITOR PLAINTIFF |
||
February 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Statute of Limitations |
||
February 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
February 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
February 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affirmation of Military Investigation |
||
February 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.