Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
John Button, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yorio, Ronald Anthony, against Gina Z Button, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin M. Nasca presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin M. Nasca Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 24, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | REPORT OF ATTORNEY REFEREE | ||
August 02, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
August 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
July 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
May 26, 2021 | COMPLAINT AMENDED | ||
April 20, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 26, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 25, 2021 |
CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
March 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.