Case Last Refreshed: 12 hours ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Melissa Lafler, Melissa S Lafler, Schuyler Hospital Inc, in the jurisdiction of Steuben County, NY, . Steuben County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Craig J. Doran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCraig J. Doran Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSteuben County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: May 18, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: January 14, 2022FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
January 14, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE | ||
January 14, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
December 02, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EF28 Notice of Conversion to E-file |
||
November 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
April 20, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #3) WEBCIVIL SUPREME MOTION DETAIL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.