Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Caitlin Tracy, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Ramsey, Daniel Charles, against Andrew Rheome, St. Lawrence Federal Credit Union, represented by Collins, John Kevin, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 9 Rpapl Partition) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 11, 2021JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 12, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 12, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
March 11, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 10, 2021 | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 10, 2021 |
RJI -RE: OTHER PARTITION ACTION |
||
February 25, 2021 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.