Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Deery, Elizabeth Emily, Montalbano, Gaetano, Powell, Larry T, Wallace, Stephanie Marie, against Lisa H Russell, represented by Vanzyverden, William, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions350 days |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 11, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2019JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: September 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 09, 2019 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
||
December 09, 2019 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) INVOICE |
||
December 09, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY INVESTIGATION |
||
December 09, 2019 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
December 09, 2019 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) JUDGMENT |
||
November 26, 2019 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 26, 2019 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 19, 2019 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
November 05, 2019 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.