Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Karaszewski, Darleen Veronica, against Kayla Bush, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 07, 2018 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions335 days |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time336 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2019 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 07, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT Redaction Cover Page |
||
November 07, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
||
November 07, 2019 | Affirmation of Mailing of Additional Notice | ||
November 07, 2019 |
AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statue of Limitations Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statue of Limitations Redacted |
||
November 07, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Account by Original Creditor Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts and Sale of Account by Original Creditor Redacted |
||
November 07, 2019 |
AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Facts and Purchase of Account by Debt Buyer Plaintiff Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Facts and Purchase of Account by Debt Buyer Plaintiff Redacted |
||
November 07, 2019 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 19, 2018 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
December 13, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.