Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gary Titus, Karen Titus, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Schrader, Kurt David, against Carol E. Meyers, River Rock Cottages, Llc, Timothy P. Van Houter, represented by Antonucci, David Peter, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Declaratory Judgment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time1173 days |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: March 04, 2019STIPULATION - VENUE
Date: September 07, 2018ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECORD ON APPEAL |
||
December 08, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
December 08, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MEMORANDUM & ORDER |
||
October 05, 2020 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM JUSTICE MARY M. FARLEY |
||
April 15, 2020 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER STRIKING NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
April 09, 2020 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) Letter for Hon. Mary Farley |
||
February 26, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 26, 2020 | MARKED PLEADINGS | ||
February 03, 2020 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING DAY CERTAIN FOR TRIAL (NON-JURY) |
||
February 03, 2020 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM JUSTICE FARLEY/ORDER SETTING DAY CERTAIN FOR TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.