Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Paul Berry, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rubin, Bethany Ann, against G & A Group Inc, Massena Hhsc, Inc., Price Chopper Operating Co., Inc. D B A Price Chopper, The Golub Corporation D B A Price Chopper, represented by Fabrizi, Leo Thomas, Hutter, David Michael, Monaco, Mackenzie C., Peterman, Alan R, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 19, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED (Motion #001E)
Date: March 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Price Chopper Answer |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Massena HHSC, Inc. and G & A Group, Inc. Answer |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Amended Complaint |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Snow Removal Contract |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT Third Party Summons and Complaint |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Answer filed on behalf of Price Chopper Operating Company |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER on behalf of Price Chopper Operating Company |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) for Massena HHSC, Inc. and G&A Group |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.