Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Darr Lapoint, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 27, 2021AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
January 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
January 27, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
January 27, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
November 12, 2020 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
November 07, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 07, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.