Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Individually And As Parent And Natural Guardian Of M.M., Infant An, Justin Moore Individually And As Parent And Natural Guardian Of M.M., M. M. An Infant, Susan Moore Individually And As Parent And Natural Guardian Of M.M., (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by White, Michael Louis, against Darrick J Lamay, represented by Miller, Lauren M., in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (General Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 23, 2020JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: July 21, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 22, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 22, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE LETTER WITH ATTACHMENTS: PCSO, SAMPLE ADR ORDER, AND 4TH JD ADR RULES |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Social Media Demand |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of EBT to Susan Moore |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of EBT to M.M. |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION Notice of EBT to Justin Moore |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR: Defendant's Demand for Medicare and/or Medicaid Lien Information |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.