Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dustin L Dominesey, State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co. A S O Dustin L. Dominesey, State Farm Mututal Automobile Insurance Co, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Markowitz, Stuart David, against Kenneth Jr Hitchman, Sydney Hitchman, represented by Alahverdian, Erick Krikor, Leader, Henry Joseph, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court with Mary M Farley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary M Farley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time143 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 28, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 08, 2020JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE
Date: February 21, 2020ANSWER
Date: January 13, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Justice Mary M. Farley |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER FROM JUDGE.SCHEDULE PRELIM CONFERENCE.ADR RULES |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE | |
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Req for Judicial Intervention |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos rji |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos-pre conf |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST request for pc |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) for any excess coverage claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.