Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Warshaw, David Barry, against Michael Kenyon, in the jurisdiction of St. Lawrence County, NY, . St. Lawrence County, NY Superior Courts St. Lawrence County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions70 days |
Filing LocationSt. Lawrence County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseSt. Lawrence County Supreme Court |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 03, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: February 12, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.