Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Yehuda Wiesenfeld, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kim, Soo Hyun, against Pinchus Rosenberg, represented by Coleman, Christopher M., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas P Zugibe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Zugibe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 20, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
August 07, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 07, 2022 | Preliminary Conference Request | ||
June 29, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
April 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 20, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.