Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joseph Schwartz, National General Insurance Co-Aso, National General Insurance Co. A S O Joseph Schwartz, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Monaco, Russell G, against Abraham S Farkas, Aron Fischman, Energy Creators Llc, Midpost Cleaning Inc, Midpost Cleaning Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Bynum, Nicole Monica, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Property Subrogation) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's Post Depo Demands |
||
October 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Default Motion |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) SCRA Aron Fischman |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Supplemental Summons and Amended Verified Complaint |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Deposition of James Gesauldo |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deposition of Abraham Farkas |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service Aron Fischman |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.