Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Anita Sanchez, Manuel Sanchez, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Clyne, Kevin M, against Haverstraw Village Of-, Haverstraw Village Of-Bd Of Assessment, represented by Hood, Joseph N, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: April 08, 2021PETITION
Date: April 08, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 23, 2022 | NOTICE | ||
April 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
April 08, 2021 | PETITION | ||
April 08, 2021 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.