Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., Creech, Jason Wesley, Howland, Sean David, against Frimet Ehrenthal, Samuel Ehrenthal, State Tax Commission, Usa Internal Revenue Service, represented by Menashe, Yecheskel, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2010 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: May 11, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2023 | Hearing |
Not Held SMF or APPEAR Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
August 11, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
July 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #012) Motion Seq. #12&13 |
||
May 18, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #012) Motion Seq. #12&13 |
||
May 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
May 15, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 15, 2023 | ||
April 04, 2023 | Hearing |
Not Held
Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
March 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0013) Motion Submission Part Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
|
March 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #0012) Motion Submission Part Judge: Marx, Hon. Paul I. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.