Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ana Patricia Castillo Hernandez, Ana Patricia Castillo Hernandez -Guardian, W D -Infant, Wilson Devenes, An Infant Under The Age Of 14 Years Of Age, By His Mother And Natural Guardian, Ana Patricia Castillo Hernandez, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Silverman, Allyson J, against East Ramapo School District, Lime Kiln Elementary School, represented by Feldman, Christopher H, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligent Supervision) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation |
||
February 14, 2023 | Notice of Petition for Infant's Compromise Order | ||
February 14, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
||
December 20, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 30, 2022 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
September 22, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Answer to Complaint |
||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Verified Complaint |
||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Relevant Portions of W.D.'s 50-h Hearing Transcript |
||
August 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Feldman Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
August 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Documents Served on School District |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.