Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dadin Torres, Fernando Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joyce, Dwight D, against Mavis Discount Tire, Inc, represented by Bentzen, Richard D, Dolan, Adam Richard, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 13, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST | ||
December 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 09, 2022 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Defendant Mavis Discount Tire, Inc.'s Answer to Third Party Plaintiff Travelers Personal Insurance C Defendant Mavis Discount Tire, Inc.'s Answer to Third Party Plaintiff Travelers Personal Insurance C ... show more |
||
January 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 11, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 13, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 03, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 07, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 17, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.