Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jhw Construction Corp, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Rosen, Rise E, against Spring Valley Village Of, Spring Valley Village Of-Bd Of Assessment, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Paul I Marx presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul I Marx Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: April 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 30, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 23, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER TAX CERTIORARI |
||
March 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Rent Rolls |
||
March 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Verified Income and Expense Statements |
||
March 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES | ||
March 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 06, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.