Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kevon Farmer, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Russo, Matthew Paul, against Arec 30, Llc, U-Haul Co. Of New York And Vermont Inc, represented by Vetter, Christine M, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 15, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 22, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 24, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
June 24, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 23, 2021 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
June 17, 2021 | answer and discovery demands | ||
June 17, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.