Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sandra Foley As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Daniel Foley, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kelly, Eileen Mary, Mcgivney, Eileen Mary, Rigelhaupt, Peter D, against Long Island Rail Road Company D B A Mta Lirr, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority D B A Mta New York City Transit, represented by Glazer, Scott Lane, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph J Risi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph J Risi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence - Transit Authority (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2021NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: June 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
December 09, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 17, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 19, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
July 19, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 02, 2021 | Notice to Take Deposition Upon Oral Examination | ||
June 02, 2021 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Verified Complaint |
||
June 02, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Certification Pursuant to 22 NYCRR 130-1.1 and Combined Discovery Demands |
||
June 02, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
May 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.