Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Manfro, Jordan Jayce, Mckniff, Christopher Michael, Olson, Karen B., against Lindajane Greenstein, represented by Salami-Oyakhilome, Sadatu, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 09, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
January 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 16, 2022 |
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE JCS Conference Order |
||
October 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
October 05, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
October 05, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
August 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
April 26, 2022 | ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE | ||
April 06, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.