Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stephanie Bolanos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Paris, Jason L, against Haris Graca, Sadet Graca, represented by Kemp, Terence John, Vengerov, Alina, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip Hom presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip Hom Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
March 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 11, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Note of Issue and Certificate of Readiness |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Good-faith email dated January 6, 2022 |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Compliance Conference Order |
||
January 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.