Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Daniel Gibson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jacknowitz, Melvyn S, against Fazlur Rahman, Karnall Singh, Marc Morisseau, represented by Doherty, Moira A, Moskovits, Ronit Z, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 19, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 15, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS |
||
February 06, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | ||
July 14, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 01, 2021 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Compliance Conference Stipulation and Order |
||
October 26, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 11, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 06, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
July 06, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.