Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jacqueline Barrett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bernstein, Bradford H., Levy, David Shimon, Whitfield-Allah, Dana M., against Jacob Gunther, Penske Leasing And Rental Company, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P., Xyz Employer, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 28, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 28, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: July 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 02, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 05, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 06, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 30, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 27, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 10, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 28, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Demand for Authorizations Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 31, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 14, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: July 05, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 02, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
November 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
||
November 10, 2022 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #003) Certification in Compliance |
||
November 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) ATTY CERTIFICATION |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #003) Letters |
||
October 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #003) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #003) Response |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #003) Order |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #003) Email to CC Part |
||
October 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #003) Post EBT Demand for Authorizations |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.