Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gerald Cleaves Jr., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Rynecki, Scott E, against John Does -Police Officers As Yet Unidentified, Police Officer Thomas Kennedy -Shield No.22670, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, O'Brien, Gregory Boegel, Weekes, Kevon, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other - City (Assault And Battery) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 10, 2021NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)
Date: May 13, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 13, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 13, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 13, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 23, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
May 18, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 23, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 23, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 10, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 20, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK STIPULATION AND ORDER OF REMAND |
||
August 09, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
May 13, 2021 | NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI) | ||
May 13, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B PO Kennedy - Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.