Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Geoffrey K Wallace, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Haab, Galen Frederick, against Heather E Wallace, represented by Shanley, Kristin Ann, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
May 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
May 03, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 04, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 01, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
April 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 10, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
February 01, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
February 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 03, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.