Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rebecca Rawson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bruno, Danielle Rory, against Gail K Shutts, Raymond H Shutts, represented by Fendt, John Louis, Zehe, Theresa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 13, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 24, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 13, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 20, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Defendant Bill of Particulars Response |
||
August 20, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant Resp to Plaintiffs Demands |
||
July 29, 2021 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
May 12, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Raymond Shutts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.