Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Fulton Savings Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mirabito, Jerome A., against David S Ellingwood, Oswego County Department Of Social Services, in the jurisdiction of Oswego County, NY, . Oswego County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOswego County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS Stipulation Cancelling Lis Pendens |
||
November 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 01, 2021 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
October 28, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
October 14, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 13, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 10, 2021 | NOTICE | ||
September 08, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 03, 2021 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
May 03, 2021 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.