Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lexington Avenue Fcu, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Drexler, Mark Andrew, against Michael E Lamphron, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts with Frederick G Reed presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick G Reed Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2021ORDER - AWARDING FEE
Date: July 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 29, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) Visa Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL
Date: April 08, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: July 02, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - PARTIAL | ||
July 06, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 02, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
July 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 01, 2021 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE | ||
June 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
June 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
June 29, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Military Check |
||
June 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
June 29, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.