Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Byzfunder Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Custom Car Concepts, Matthew Robert Ogram, in the jurisdiction of Ontario County, NY, . Ontario County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOntario County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 21, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 16, 2021 | Affirmation of Non Military | ||
June 16, 2021 | Affirmation of 2nd Mailing | ||
June 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
||
June 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement |
||
June 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Verified Complaint |
||
June 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
May 06, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.