Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Casey J Pelow, The Board Of Managers Of Village Green Of Syracuse Condominium, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time433 days |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 07, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 18, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
November 18, 2021 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 26, 2021 | TERMS OF SALE | ||
August 31, 2021 | Proof of Service - Notice of Sale | ||
August 31, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 14, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing (certificate of service) |
||
July 14, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Filed by AXS 104136 |
||
July 13, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 08, 2021 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE Amended |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.