Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Caitlin J. Mcmonagle, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kirwan, Terry J., against Cleland Real Estate Group, Greater Syracuse Moving & Storage, Inc., represented by Catalano, Thomas Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Falling Ice) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 12, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Trial Scheduling Letter |
||
May 09, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
April 13, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 27, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 26, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 08, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR Preliminary Conference 7/27/22 at 10:00 a.m. via Teams |
||
June 08, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order form |
||
June 02, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 12, 2021 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.