Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
James M. Raite, Time Cap Development Corp., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Dodd, Paul Douglas, Givas, Thomas Peter, against Heidi Sullivan, William Sullivan, represented by Gaetano, Joseph Anthony, Hulslander, Kevin E, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 16, 2021ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 02, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 16, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: December 02, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 02, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 02, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 26, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 02, 2022 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
December 02, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Commercial Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order form |
||
December 02, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT ADR Preliminary Conference 1/23/23 at 11:00 a.m. via Teams |
||
April 08, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
March 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
March 16, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
March 01, 2021 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.