Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Renzi Bros., Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Zachary Yost, Zdb Holdings Inc. D B A Champs Pizzeria & Fish Fry, represented by Galli, Anthony C., in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Robert E Antonacci presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert E Antonacci Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: October 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 02, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: October 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 09, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 17, 2021AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
October 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 20, 2021 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
October 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
September 09, 2021 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1) corrected amount |
||
September 09, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
September 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES | ||
September 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) agreement |
||
September 07, 2021 | ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
August 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.