Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Richard Damico, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Liddell, Robert B., against Ronald Tyler D B A Rainbow International Of Onondaga & Oswego Counties A K A Ron Tyler, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 31, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE, Judgment, Bill of Costs & AOS |
||
June 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
||
June 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Application for Judgment |
||
June 15, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment and bill of costs |
||
June 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service of S&C |
||
June 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Additional Service of Summons |
||
March 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Addition Service of Summons |
||
March 31, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
February 08, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.