Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Auburn Community Hospital, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Erin M Chambers, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County, NY, . Onondaga County, NY Superior Courts with Gregory R Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory R Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 05, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 11, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 21, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 21, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing of Notice of Motion | ||
November 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service by Mail of Information Subpoena |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Restraining Notice |
||
November 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Certified Green Card |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Questionnaire |
||
November 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.