Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Jessica J Lugo, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 03, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Additional Mailing - Mailed 05/04/2021 |
||
April 28, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 28, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
April 09, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.