Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lucy Kerr And William Kerr, As Wife And Husband, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Viola, Robert, against Patricia Dusett, William Dusett, represented by Burgio, James Philip, Messina, Stephanie, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 06, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Amended |
||
November 22, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 13, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 06, 2021 | Demand for Bill of Particulars | ||
May 06, 2021 | Answer to Amended Complaint | ||
May 06, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of Deposition |
||
May 06, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery Demands |
||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 09, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.