Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Geovanni Torres Sepulveda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Caserta, Thomas J., against Jinira Cruz Salgado, represented by Reed, Maria Jose, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Expedited Matrimonial Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeExpedited Matrimonial Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT | ||
January 22, 2023 | SEPARATION AGREEMENT | ||
September 25, 2022 | DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF PROPOSED DISPOSITION | ||
January 10, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
June 29, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
June 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 21, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
April 21, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
April 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.